09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2142.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2509.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2450.) Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/14/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |||
07/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
07/01/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/29/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1621.) (June 28). | |||
06/14/2011 | Set for hearing June 28. | |||
06/08/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/03/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |