07/07/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/07/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
07/05/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1711.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
07/01/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/13/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/06/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/01/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |