06/21/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/21/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
06/18/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3956.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/14/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
06/14/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5303.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/29/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2005.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/30/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/11/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |