07/14/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/14/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
07/11/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/11/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2261.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |||
07/01/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
07/01/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1690.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/16/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |