|
08/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6014.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3425.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|