LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR51
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR51
Action History
08/25/2011
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
07/14/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS.
07/07/2011
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
07/07/2011
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1752.) Ordered to the Assembly.
06/30/2011
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
06/22/2011
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.