California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR53 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/15/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 53INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Evans (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Chesbro) AUGUST 15, 2011 Relative to the CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 53, as introduced, Evans. CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 101 in the County of Mendocino as the CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Officer Paul Clyde Jarske was born December 15, 1934, to Andrew and Mona Jarske, in Hankinson, North Dakota; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske graduated from Hankinson High School in 1952 and joined the United States Air Force shortly thereafter; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske was married to his best friend, Nancy, on September 27, 1957, and had two wonderful children, Michael, born on June 27, 1958, and Andrea, born on May 9, 1960; and WHEREAS, After an honorable discharge from the United States Air Force in 1963, Officer Jarske joined the California Department of Corrections at the California Medical Facility in Vacaville until his induction into the California Highway Patrol in 1964; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske graduated from the California Highway Patrol Academy in 1964 and, upon graduation, was assigned to the Norwalk (Santa Fe Springs) area for approximately two years before being transferred to the Concord area, where he served five years, the Golden Gate Division, where he served seven years, and finally the Laytonville Resident Post Garberville area, where he spent the remainder of his career; and WHEREAS, Throughout that time, Officer Jarske held several titles, including motor officer, front desk officer, and member of the auto theft unit; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske, badge number 3493, was killed in the line of duty on February 24, 1981, when his patrol car veered off the road due to severe weather conditions and plummeted 100 feet before finally coming to rest underwater; and WHEREAS, An innocent bystander attempted to save Officer Jarske's life and held his head above water until help arrived; however, he succumbed to his injuries at Howard Memorial Hospital; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske is survived by his wife, Nancy, son, Michael, daughter, Andrea, two grandchildren, Paul, born on December 26, 2000, and Michelle, born on November 18, 2002, and his sister, Joyce; and WHEREAS, Officer Jarske was a hardworking, dedicated officer who had the physical strength and mental ability to do his job. He was both feared and respected, but was one of the most tenderhearted people around; and WHEREAS, He was known for being an honest, loyal man with high morals and a great sense of humor and was deeply in love with his wife; and WHEREAS, In his spare time, Officer Jarske enjoyed hunting, fishing, anything to do with the outdoors, reading western novels, and watching football; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Jarske's great contributions and sacrifice in service of the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 101 in the County of Mendocino as the CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 101 between Branscomb Road, milepost marker 69.50, and milepost marker 74.50, in the County of Mendocino as the CHP Officer Paul C. Jarske Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.