09/12/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/12/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
09/07/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
09/06/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2941.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
09/01/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). | |||
09/01/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/29/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/29/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2087.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/15/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |