BILL NUMBER: SCR 56CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 95 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 15, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee (Coauthor: Assembly Member Ma) AUGUST 18, 2011 Relative to California Firefighters Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 56, Yee. California Firefighters Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim October 1, 2011, as California Firefighters Memorial Day. WHEREAS, The State of California will forever remember those brave firefighters who have made the ultimate sacrifice in order to ensure the safety and protection of all Californians; and WHEREAS, Their bravery and commitment to the community have not only been proven within the borders of our state, but have extended to other states and countries in time of danger and devastation; and WHEREAS, The heroic men and women who have chosen to pursue firefighting do so not only as a noble career choice, but as their lifestyle that benefits the communities in which they live; and WHEREAS, The Memorial Wall at the State Capitol will forever honor those who made the ultimate sacrifice this year along with over 1,100 of the previously fallen whose names are inscribed on the wall; and WHEREAS, Those who wish to honor all the brave firefighters who gave their lives shall join with firefighters and their families for the California Firefighters Memorial Ceremony 2011 to be held on October 1, 2011, at the State Capitol; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims Saturday, October 1, 2011, as California Firefighters Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those firefighters who have given their lives in the line of duty and to express appreciation to those who continue each day to protect our families and our hopes and dreams; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.