LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR57
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR57
Action History
04/19/2012
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/17/2012
Set for hearing April 24.
03/29/2012
Set for hearing April 17.
02/02/2012
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
08/22/2011
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.