|
08/23/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2448.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 902.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 542.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|