04/04/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2012. | |||
04/04/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
03/29/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4186.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/02/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
02/02/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2762.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
01/18/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |