03/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2012. | |||
03/13/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
03/08/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/08/2012 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/01/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 1). | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
02/09/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 2785.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/07/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/06/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
02/02/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/25/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |