02/28/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2012. | |||
02/28/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
02/27/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
02/23/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Page 3798.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
02/21/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 17). | |||
02/09/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
02/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/02/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |