05/21/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/21/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/14/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3405.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |