LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR69
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR69
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR69
Compare Versions
SCR69 Chaptered May 3, 2012
SCR69 Enrolled May 1, 2012
SCR69 Amended April 16, 2012
SCR69 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR69 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR69 Chaptered May 3, 2012
SCR69 Enrolled May 1, 2012
SCR69 Amended April 16, 2012
SCR69 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR69 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare