LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR7
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR7
Compare Versions
SCR7 Chaptered May 23, 2011
SCR7 Enrolled May 20, 2011
SCR7 Amended March 21, 2011
SCR7 Amended March 8, 2011
SCR7 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SCR7 Chaptered May 23, 2011
SCR7 Enrolled May 20, 2011
SCR7 Amended March 21, 2011
SCR7 Amended March 8, 2011
SCR7 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare