05/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/09/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4677.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/09/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/09/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3081.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/28/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/20/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |