California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR79 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 26, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012