03/25/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2011. | |||
03/25/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
03/24/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/15/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
03/14/2011 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 545.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). | |||
03/03/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/03/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 283.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/02/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |