09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6739.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/09/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/16/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |