|
08/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6179.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5866.)
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Set for hearing June 25.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3896.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing June 12.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|