06/11/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/11/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
06/07/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3792.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
06/04/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 5228.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). | |||
05/23/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3395.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/24/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |