03/10/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2011. | |||
03/10/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
03/10/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 308.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/08/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
03/07/2011 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 497.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 3). | |||
02/28/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
02/28/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 270.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/23/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |