|
08/31/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6334.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6089.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3896.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2012
|
Set for hearing June 12.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|