08/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/09/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. | |||
08/06/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/06/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
07/05/2012 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5606.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/02/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). | |||
06/28/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/25/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4057.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/20/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
06/14/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |