BILL NUMBER: SCR 92CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 67 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 11, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 11, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 6, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Fuller (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member John A. Prez) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Blakeslee, Cannella, Kehoe, Lieu, Pavley, Rubio, Strickland, Vargas, and Wyland) MAY 25, 2012 Relative to Navy Week Sacramento. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 92, Fuller. Navy Week Sacramento. This measure would recognize the United States Navy for its contributions to California, its communities, and its citizens by proclaiming the week of July 16 to July 22, inclusive, as Navy Week Sacramento. WHEREAS, The United States Navy has been an integral part of California's history since statehood; and WHEREAS, The United States of America has the world's finest Navy, a global force for good, serving as America's away team, meeting threats and providing assistance whenever needed; and WHEREAS, Navy Week Sacramento will give Sacramento area residents an opportunity to meet some of the United States Navy's outstanding sailors and learn about the United States Navy's critical mission and its broad ranging capabilities in executing maritime strategy on the water, under the water, and over the water; and WHEREAS, Navy Week Sacramento will showcase the volunteer spirit of sailors in providing assistance to Sacramento area community projects; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy is the largest component of the United States Department of Defense in California, and the total spending for the United States Department of Defense in California in 2008-09 fiscal year expenditures was $56.7 billion; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy has nine major installations in California, including installations in the Counties of San Diego, Imperial, Orange, Los Angeles, Kings, Ventura, San Bernardino, Kern, and Inyo; and WHEREAS, The County of San Diego supports the largest naval complex in the world, including homeporting of aircraft carriers, surface ships, submarines, aircraft, providing maintenance, and serving as the headquarters of the United States Navy's SEALs and Research and Development command; and WHEREAS, In the County of San Diego, the military has supported 354,627 jobs and had a direct economic contribution of $18.2 billion, and 26 percent of jobs in the County of San Diego were created or supported by military spending, with additional ships slated to arrive; and WHEREAS, Naval Air Station Lemoore in the County of Kings is the Navy's west coast Master Jet Air Station, directly employing 7,600 people, is the 3rd largest industry in the County of Kings and 10th largest industry in the County of Fresno, contributed $654,000,000 to the regional economy, and is slated for additional growth; and WHEREAS, Naval Base Ventura County provides airfield, seaport, and base support services to fleet operating forces and shore activities, employs more than 19,000 military and civilian personnel making it the largest employer in the County of Ventura, and, per a 2006 study, had an economic impact exceeding $1.2 billion; and WHEREAS, China Lake Naval Weapons Center, in California's High Desert, is the Navy's largest single landholder, its 1.1 million acres represent 85 percent of the Navy's land for research, development, test, and evaluation use and 38 percent of the Navy's total land holdings worldwide; and WHEREAS, Naval Weapons Station Seal Beach, the United States premier weapons station, is designated as the United States Navy's best small shore command for 2012, contributing over $136,000,000 in economic benefits and some 2,000 jobs; and WHEREAS, Naval Air Facility El Centro is the top Naval Aviation Training installation, where visiting squadrons practice gunnery, bombing, carrier landings, and air combat, and the winter home of the Blue Angels; and WHEREAS, Naval Support Activity Monterey is home of the nation's foremost national security research university, with over 3,500 military and civilian students enrolled and a direct annual economic contribution of $762,000,000; and WHEREAS, San Clemente and San Nicolas Islands are owned by the United States Navy and provide critical support for military training and research, development, testing, and evaluation, and have been widely recognized for their preservation of unique habitat and species, including the second largest breeding colony of northern elephant seals and the largest breeding population of California sea lions in the state; and WHEREAS, The Secretary of the Navy has stated that energy independence is a national security issue and has established goals for the United States Navy to reduce petroleum use in the fleet by 50 percent by 2015, produce at least 50 percent of shore-based energy requirements from alternative sources, and require 50 percent of United States Navy installations to be net-zero and 50 percent of total United States Navy energy consumption to come from alternative sources by 2020; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy has demonstrated its commitment to using alternative energy by sailing a ship from San Diego to Port Hueneme with a 50 percent biofuel blend, has SmartGrid projects ongoing at California installations, and is funding significant research with California companies to develop advanced biofuels from nonfood sources, as well as developing wind, solar, geothermal, and other renewable energy sources; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy is a leader in recycling and solid waste management having diverted 146,740 tons from landfills in 2010 for an overall diversion rate of 72.9 percent; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy owns large tracts of land near urban areas that have become recognized for their abundance of wildlife and endangered species and the Navy has been recognized for its stewardship of these lands that make its installations among the most critical for the protection of California ecosystems; and WHEREAS, The United States Navy administers and protects valuable cultural resources, including more than 20,000 prehistoric and historic-period archaeological sites, such as the Coso Rock Art District, a National Historic Landmark at China Lake, and more than 425 National Register of Historic Places--listed and eligible historic buildings throughout California; and WHEREAS, United States sailors are widely recognized for their volunteer service and are active in tutoring, coaching, and contributing members of their communities; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California recognizes the United States Navy for its contributions to California, its communities, and its citizens by proclaiming the week of July 16 to July 22, inclusive, as Navy Week Sacramento; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.