California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR95 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/03/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 95CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 64 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 3, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Gaines MAY 31, 2012 Relative to Olympic Games. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 95, Gaines. International Olympic Day. This measure would recognize June 23, 2012, as International Olympic Day, and would honor all of the dedicated Olympic athletes. WHEREAS, For over 100 years, the Olympic movement has built a more peaceful and better world by educating young people through amateur athletics, by bringing together athletes from many countries in friendly competition, and by forging new relationships bound by friendship, solidarity, and fair play; and WHEREAS, The United States Olympic Committee is dedicated to coordinating and developing amateur athletic activity in the United States to foster productive working relationships among sports-related organizations; and WHEREAS, California promotes and supports amateur athletic activities involving Olympic and Paralympic sports; and WHEREAS, California promotes and encourages physical fitness and public participation in amateur athletic activities; and WHEREAS, California recognizes an Olympic Day event to inspire and benefit youth that will take place June 20 at Raley Field, cohosted by the Sacramento Parks and Recreation Department and the Sacramento River Cats baseball team, led by Olympic alpine skier Starr Walton Hurley; and WHEREAS, California recognizes the celebration welcoming the Chinese Olympic Fencing Team for training and pre-Olympic Games competition alongside the United States Fencing Team in San Francisco; and WHEREAS, California assists organizations and persons concerned with sports in the development of athletic programs for able-bodied and disabled athletes regardless of age, race, or gender; and WHEREAS, June 23 is the anniversary of the founding of the modern Olympic movement, representing the date on which the Congress of Paris approved the proposal of Pierre de Coubertin to found the modern Olympics; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes June 23, 2012, as International Olympic Day, and honors all of the dedicated Olympic athletes; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.