LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR12
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR12
Action History
08/16/2012
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio.
08/09/2012
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
08/08/2012
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
06/21/2012
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
08/15/2011
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.