09/15/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/15/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
09/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (September 9). Read. Adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 3231.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
09/06/2011 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
09/02/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
09/02/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2274.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/25/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2058.) (August 25). | |||
08/23/2011 | Set for hearing August 25. | |||
08/18/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
08/16/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |