09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 6744.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/30/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). | |||
06/18/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/18/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3896.) (June 12). | |||
05/16/2012 | Set for hearing June 12. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/09/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |