08/16/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/16/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
08/13/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/28/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
06/28/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 5524.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18). | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
03/29/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3022.) (March 27). | |||
03/20/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
03/01/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
02/13/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |