06/25/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/25/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
06/21/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/21/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5394.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). | |||
05/25/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3531.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 9). | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
03/22/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |