08/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/21/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6062.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3315.) (April 24). | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/22/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |