LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR20
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR20
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR20
Compare Versions
SJR20 Chaptered June 21, 2012
SJR20 Enrolled June 19, 2012
SJR20 Amended June 14, 2012
SJR20 Amended June 6, 2012
SJR20 Introduced March 1, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SJR20 Chaptered June 21, 2012
SJR20 Enrolled June 19, 2012
SJR20 Amended June 14, 2012
SJR20 Amended June 6, 2012
SJR20 Introduced March 1, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare