08/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/21/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6030.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
06/21/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/21/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4027.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/26/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |