08/16/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/16/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
08/13/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/07/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/06/2012 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5762.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/28/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |||
06/25/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/18/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/18/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3956.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/14/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/22/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |