08/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/21/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6061.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
06/28/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/28/2012 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4115.) (June 26). | |||
06/16/2012 | Set for hearing June 26. | |||
06/15/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. (Corrected June 16.) | |||
06/07/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/29/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |