09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5106.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/30/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/30/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 6668.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/29/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/28/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.) | |||
08/27/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
08/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
08/13/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/13/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4468.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
07/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/06/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |