California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1002 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/23/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1002AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bloom FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 9250.20 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1002, as amended, Bloom. Vehicles: registration fee: sustainable communities strategies. Existing law imposes a registration fee to be paid to the Department of Motor Vehicles for the registration of every vehicle or trailer coach of a type subject to registration, except those vehicles that are expressly exempted from the payment of registration fees. Existing law, until January 1, 2016, imposes a $3 increase on that fee, $2 of which is to be deposited into the Alternative and Renewable Fuel and Vehicle Technology Fund and $1 of which is to be deposited into the Enhanced Fleet Modernization Subaccount. Existing law requires designated transportation planning agencies, some of which are metropolitan planning organizations under federal law, to prepare and adopt a regional transportation plan directed at achieving a coordinated and balanced regional transportation system, including, but not limited to, mass transportation and highway, railroad, bicycle, and pedestrian facilities and services. Existing law requires each metropolitan planning organization to include, among other things, a sustainable communities strategy in the regional transportation plan. This bill would, in addition to any other taxes and fees specified in the Vehicle Code and the Revenue and Taxation Code, impose a tax of $6 to be paid at the time of registration or renewal of registration of every vehicle subject to registration under the Vehicle Code in a county that is in a metropolitan planning organization required to prepare a sustainable communities strategy as part of its regional transportation plan, except as specified. This bill would require the Department of Motor Vehicles, after deducting all reasonable administrative costs, to remit the money generated by the tax for deposit in the Sustainable Communities Strategy Subaccount, which the bill would establish in the Motor Vehicle Account. The bill would make funds in the subaccount available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for specified purposes. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9250.20 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 9250.20. (a) In addition to any other fees specified in this code and the Revenue and Taxation Code, a fee of six dollars ($6) shall be paid at the time of registration or renewal of registration of every vehicle subject to registration under this code in a county that is in a metropolitan planning organization required to prepare a sustainable communities strategy as part of its regional transportation plan pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 65080 of the Government Code, except vehicles described in subdivision (a) of Section 5014.1 and those vehicles that are expressly exempted from the payment of registration fees under this code. (b) After deducting all reasonable administrative costs incurred pursuant to this section, the department shall remit all revenue generated pursuant to this section for deposit in the Sustainable Communities Strategy Subaccount which is hereby established in the Motor Vehicle Account and made available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for the following: (1) Fifty percent shall be appropriated to cities and counties on a per capita basis for planning and implementation of projects consistent with the purposes of sustainable communities strategies and approved sustainable communities plans, including  , but not limited to,  first-mile-last-mile bicycle and pedestrian infrastructure projects that are intended to improve transit access in transit priority zones,  and  bicycle and pedestrian infrastructure  as part of  complete streets projects,  and     Safe   Routes to   School   projects,  road and highway maintenance and repair that also facilitates transit and bicycle use  , and pedestrian safety projects if the road and highway maintenance and repair costs make up no more than 20 percent of the total pedestrian safety project cost. These funds may also be used for the construction and planning of, and as local matching funds for purposes of applying for federal or state transportation grants for, projects that are consistent with the purposes specified in this paragraph  . (2) Forty percent shall be appropriated to transportation commissions and transit operators to support transit operations and maintain and expand reduced fare programs, including  , but not limited to,  transit passes for students, low-income youth, seniors, and persons with disabilities. (3) Ten percent shall be appropriated to metropolitan planning organizations and transportation planning agencies for competitive grants for implementation of sustainable communities strategies,  including, but not limited to,   including  competitive planning and implementation grants to cities and counties on a per capita basis for planning and implementing livable communities and transit-oriented development and urban infill projects, and to complete streets, and bicycle or pedestrian projects  and plans  , consistent with an approved sustainable communities plan.