Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|