LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1019
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1019
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1019
Compare Versions
AB1019 Chaptered October 13, 2013
AB1019 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB1019 Amended August 26, 2013
AB1019 Amended May 6, 2013
AB1019 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1019 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1019 Chaptered October 13, 2013
AB1019 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB1019 Amended August 26, 2013
AB1019 Amended May 6, 2013
AB1019 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1019 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare