|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 301, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2657.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1884.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|