|
05/13/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 4702.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3269.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 1506.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1448.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|