10/11/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2013. | |||
10/11/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2095.). | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 1465.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |