Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1326.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|