California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 13, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013