|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1877.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|