|
08/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|