California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1074 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill August 26, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013